California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB667 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill July 8, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015