|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 698, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2990.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3016.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2584.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1670.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|