California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB672 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015