|
09/03/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2522.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1987.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 977.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|