|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 2836.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2352.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 1780.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|