California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB678 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Amended

Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 9, 2015
Bill June 22, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015