California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB681 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2015

Amended

Bill July 15, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015