Assembly | 05/04/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | Read first time. To print. |