California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB689 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill May 18, 2015