California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB69 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2015

Amended

Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015
Bill May 22, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015
Bill March 16, 2015