|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 3060.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2642.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Measure version as amended on September 4 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 1915.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|