|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 2945.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2480.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 969.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|