California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB701 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/25/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 701ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 2, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 22, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 7, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Cristina Garcia and Eggman (Coauthors: Assembly Members Arambula, Atkins, Bonilla, Bonta, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Grove, Lopez, Maienschein, McCarty, Olsen, and Williams) (Coauthors: Senators Anderson, Beall, Glazer, Hall, Hancock, Hertzberg, Hill, Leno, Leyva, and Stone) FEBRUARY 25, 2015 An act to add Section 263.1 to the Penal Code, relating to sex crimes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 701, Cristina Garcia. Sex crimes: rape. Existing law defines rape and spousal rape as an act of sexual intercourse accomplished under specified circumstances indicating a lack of consent, force, or duress, as specified. Existing law additionally makes various acts, including sodomy and oral copulation without consent or sexual intercourse with a minor, unlawful as sexual assault. This bill would state the findings of the Legislature that all forms of nonconsensual sexual assault may be considered rape for purposes of the gravity of the offense and the support of survivors and would state that this is declarative of existing law. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 263.1 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 263.1. (a) The Legislature finds and declares that all forms of nonconsensual sexual assault may be considered rape for purposes of the gravity of the offense and the support of survivors. (b) This section is declarative of existing law.