California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB701 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill September 4, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015