California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB703 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill April 13, 2015
Bill March 23, 2015