|
08/17/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 218, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2255.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1755.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1224.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|