|
09/30/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 31. Page 6244.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 5166.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on ED., JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 1850.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1685.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|