California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB71 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2015

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill July 6, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015