Assembly | 02/01/2016 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2016 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Brown. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2016 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Brown. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2015 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | Read first time. To print. |