California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB713 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 06/01/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 713AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Weber  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   McCarty,   O'Donnell,   and Thurmond   )  FEBRUARY 25, 2015 An act to amend  Section   Sections 33190 and  48010 of, and to add Section 48001 to, the Education Code, relating to kindergarten. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 713, as amended, Weber. Elementary education: kindergarten.  Under   (1)     Under  existing law, a person between the ages of 6 and 18 years who is not exempted by law is subject to compulsory full-time education. Existing law excludes a child under 6 years of age from the public schools, subject to specified exceptions. Existing law requires a school district maintaining a kindergarten to admit a child who will have his or her 5th birthday on or before certain specified dates during that school year. Existing law also requires  that  a child who will have his or her 6th birthday on or before specified dates  to  be admitted to the first grade of an elementary school. This bill, beginning with the 2017-18 school year, would require a child to have completed one year of kindergarten before he or she may be admitted to the first grade, thereby imposing a state-mandated local program.  (2) Existing law requires each person, firm, association, partnership, or corporation offering or conducting private school instruction at the elementary or high school level to, between the first and 15th day of October of each year, file with the Superintendent of Public Instruction an affidavit or statement, under penalty of perjury, by the owner or other administrator setting forth specified information.   This bill would specify that private school instruction at the elementary level includes kindergarten. The bill also would make nonsubstantive changes to these provisions.   The   (3)     The  California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 33190 of the   Education Code   is amended to read:  33190.  Every   (a)     Each  person, firm, association, partnership, or corporation offering or conducting private school instruction  on   at  the elementary  , including kindergarten,  or high school level  shall   shall,  between the first and 15th day of October of each  year, commencing on October 1, 1967,   year,  file with the Superintendent  of Public Instruction  an affidavit or statement, under penalty of perjury, by the owner or other  head   administrator  setting forth the following information for the current year:  (a)   (1)  All names, whether real or fictitious,  of   under which  the person, firm, association, partnership, or corporation  under which it  has done  and   or  is doing business.  (b)   (2)  The address, including city and street, of  every   each  place of  doing  business of the person, firm, association, partnership, or corporation within  the State of  California.  (c)   (3)  The address, including city and street, of the location of the records of the person, firm, association, partnership, or corporation, and the name and address, including city and street, of the custodian of  such   those  records.  (d)   (4)  The  names   name  and  addresses,   address,  including city and street, of  the directors, if any,   each director  and principal  officers   officer  of the person, firm, association, partnership, or corporation.  (e)   (5)  The school enrollment, by grades, number of teachers,  whether  coeducational or enrollment limited to boys or  girls   girls,  and boarding facilities.  (f)   (6)  That the following records are maintained at the address stated, and are true and accurate:  (1)   (A)  The records required to be kept by Section 48222.  (2)   (B)  The courses of study offered by the institution.  (3)   (C)  The  names   name  and  addresses,   address,  including city and street, of  its faculty,   each faculty member,  together with a record of the educational qualifications of each.  (g)   (7)  Criminal record summary information  has been   was  obtained pursuant to Section 44237.  Whenever   (b)     If  two or more private schools are under the effective control or supervision of a single administrative unit,  such   that  administrative unit may comply with  the provisions of  this section on behalf of each  of the schools   school  under its control or supervision by submitting one report.  Filing   (c)     Filing  pursuant to this section  shall not be interpreted to   does not  mean, and it shall be unlawful for  any   a  school to expressly or impliedly represent by any means whatsoever, that the State of California, the  Superintendent of Public Instruction,   Superintendent,  the  State Board of Education,   state board,  the  State Department of Education,   department,  or  any   a  division or bureau of the department, or  any   an  accrediting agency has made  any  an  evaluation, recognition, approval, or endorsement of the school or  course   course,  unless this is an actual fact.  The   (d)     The  Superintendent  of Public Instruction  shall prepare and publish a list of  each  private elementary  , including kindergarten,  and high  schools to include   school that includes  the name and address of the school and the name of the school owner or administrator.  SECTION 1.   SEC. 2.  Section 48001 is added to the Education Code, to read: 48001. Beginning with the 2017-18 school year, a child shall have completed one year of kindergarten before he or she may be admitted to the first grade.  SEC. 2.   SEC. 3.  Section 48010 of the Education Code is amended to read: 48010. (a) A child shall be admitted to the first grade of an elementary school during the first month of a school year if the child has completed one year of kindergarten and will have his or her sixth birthday on or before one of the following dates: (1) December 2 of the 2011-12 school year. (2) November 1 of the 2012-13 school year. (3) October 1 of the 2013-14 school year. (4) September 1 of the 2014-15 school year and each school year thereafter. (b) For good cause, the governing board of a school district may permit a child of proper age to be admitted to a class after the first school month of the school term.  SEC. 3.   SEC. 4.  If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.