|
09/13/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5022.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3525.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.) In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|