California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB721 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill July 8, 2015
Bill June 24, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015