07/13/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2015. | |||
07/13/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/01/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 1614.). | ||
Senate | 06/10/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 9). | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 1012.) | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 7). | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | Read first time. To print. |