|
09/21/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 303, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2554.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2111.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 885.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|