|
10/01/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 406, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2831.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2367.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1348.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|