BILL NUMBER: AB 735CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 220 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 29, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 29, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JANUARY 27, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ridley-Thomas FEBRUARY 25, 2015 An act to repeal Section 67454 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 735, Ridley-Thomas. Postsecondary education: Student Athlete Bill of Rights. Existing law provides for a system of postsecondary education in this state. This system includes the University of California, administered by the Regents of the University of California, the California State University, administered by the Trustees of the California State University, the California Community Colleges, administered by the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, and independent institutions of higher education. Existing law establishes a Student Athlete Bill of Rights, which, among other things, provides for the protection of athletic scholarships for student athletes and requires certain institutions of higher education to pay the premiums for specified student athletes for insurance claims resulting from their participation in those institutions' athletic programs. Existing law repeals the provisions granting these rights to student athletes on January 1, 2021. This bill would delete the repeal date for these provisions, thereby extending the operation of these rights for student athletes indefinitely. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 67454 of the Education Code is repealed.