California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB738 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill July 16, 2015
Bill May 11, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015