Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2016
|
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Re-referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|