|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2795.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2806.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2341.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1619.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1260.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|