|
09/01/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 226, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 2524.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2052.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1480.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1437.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|