|
08/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 152, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1986.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1216.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|