Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | Read first time. To print. |