California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB762 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 8, 2015