Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1889.) | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2015 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 21). | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | Read first time. To print. |