|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 779, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 2613.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2150.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 1903.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 1904.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|