California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB776 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015