California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB778 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 29, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 14, 2015

Amended

Bill April 13, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015