Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mendoza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 15). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1565.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|