California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB793 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill June 9, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015