|
09/28/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 326, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2670.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2201.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1764.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|