California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB80 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 6, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill March 16, 2015