Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2015 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & R. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |