|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 2903.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2410.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1101.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|