Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.) In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2015 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 7). | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |