|
10/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2569.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1809.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|