LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB812
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB812
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB812
Action History
Assembly
04/22/2015
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Assembly
04/21/2015
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
04/09/2015
Measure version as amended on March 26 corrected.
Assembly
03/26/2015
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
02/27/2015
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
Assembly
02/26/2015
Read first time. To print.