California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB82 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill May 13, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015