Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2016 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1449.) | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |