Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 1988.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 5.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 1257.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|