Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |